SD HB1085 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Redefine the criteria for classifying land as agricultural for tax purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redefine the criteria for classifying land as agricultural for tax purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in amendments (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Taxation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House of Representatives: Motion to amend (Y: 32 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - House - House of Representatives: Reconsidered (Y: 44 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-02 - House - House Taxation: Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 488
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 459
2021-03-01SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 368
2021-02-24SenateTaxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 1
2021-02-24SenateTaxation Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 1085J
2021-02-24SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 208
2021-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 27. H.J. 228
2021-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 227 Amendment 1085E
2021-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 26. H.J. 223
2021-02-04HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 218
2021-02-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 35. H.J. 218
2021-02-02HouseTaxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2.
2021-02-02HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1085D
2021-02-02HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1085B
2021-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 119

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/21907
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/212951.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/215677.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216829.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218386.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218959.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/215084.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/215488.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216667.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216776.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/217196.pdf
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68178
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68497
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68605
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68611
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/68612
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70022
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70299
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70519

Bill Comments 750

feedback