SD HB1085 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 33. H.J. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 33. H.J. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for permanent daylight savings time.
Title
Provide for permanent daylight savings time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 34 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 33. H.J. 168 |
2020-02-04 | House | Intent to reconsider H.J. 121 |
2020-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 33. H.J. 121 |
2020-01-29 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2020-01-29 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1085A |
2020-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 58 |