SD HB1084 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding the duration of restrictive contracts or declarations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding the duration of restrictive contracts or declarations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-09HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 H.J. 530
2021-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 445
2021-03-02HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 467
2021-03-01SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 366
2021-02-25SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 1
2021-02-25SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-25SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-05SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 201
2021-02-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 14. H.J. 214
2021-02-04HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 214 Amendment 1084A
2021-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 189
2021-02-02HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
2021-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 119

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback