SD HB1083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-5)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2020 H.J. 417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-5)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2020 H.J. 417
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rename the postsecondary technical institutes as technical colleges.
Title
Rename the postsecondary technical institutes as technical colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2020 H.J. 417 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 H.J. 347 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 297 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 243 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 233 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 207 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 142 |
2020-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 25. H.J. 119 |
2020-01-29 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-29 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1083B |
2020-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 58 |