SD HB1083 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 H.J. 784
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 H.J. 784
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Change the taxation method used in the sale of certain off-road vehicles and require that the sale of these vehicles be by licensed vehicle dealers.
Title
Change the taxation method used in the sale of certain off-road vehicles and require that the sale of these vehicles be by licensed vehicle dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 H.J. 784 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2016 H.J. 767 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 496 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 724 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 461 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 421 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 384 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 261 |
2016-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 3. H.J. 328 |
2016-02-04 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 1. H.J. 274 |
2016-02-04 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1083jb |
2016-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-28 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 161 |
2016-01-22 | House | First Reading House H.J. 150 |