SD HB1083 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 23. S.J. 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 23. S.J. 509
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for term limits for brand board service.
Title
Provide for term limits for brand board service.
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Sen. Larry Lucas [D] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Rep. Mark Venner [R] |
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 10, NAYS 23. S.J. 509 | |
2012-02-16 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 462 | |
2012-02-16 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Title amended, Passed Amendment 1083tta | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-09 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 337 | |
2012-02-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 362 | |
2012-02-07 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 332 | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 67 |