SD HB1082 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding licensure for the lending of money.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding licensure for the lending of money.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2018 H.J. 596 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 588 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 565 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 529 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 497 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 297 |
2018-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 231 |
2018-01-24 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 167 |
2018-01-24 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1082wa |
2018-01-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 65 |