SD HB1082 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-9)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 44-9)
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.
Title
Grant limited immunity from arrest and prosecution for certain related offenses to persons who assist certain persons in need of emergency assistance or who are themselves in need of emergency assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 52 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Reconsidered (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Reconsidered (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 756 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 722 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 12. H.J. 713 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 670 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 670 Amendment 1082ja |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed S.J. 637 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 650 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Transportation Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 597 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 3. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 555 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 16. H.J. 514 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 514 Amendment 1082xa |
2017-02-21 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 444 |
2017-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-03 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 177 |