SD HB1082 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Signed by Governor H.J. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Signed by Governor H.J. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the conditions causing the suspension of a probationer's probationary period.
Title
Revise the conditions causing the suspension of a probationer's probationary period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 598 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 585 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 467 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 517 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 409 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 378 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 188 |
2014-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 6. H.J. 184 |
2014-01-29 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 140 |
2014-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 71 |
Subjects
Courts and Judiciary
Criminal Procedure
Felony
Penal Institutions
Prison or Jail Impact Statement
Probation and Parole
Criminal Procedure
Felony
Penal Institutions
Prison or Jail Impact Statement
Probation and Parole