SD HB1081 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability, to revise the income eligibility requirements for property and sales tax refunds, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to fund tax refunds for elderly persons and persons with a disability, to revise the income eligibility requirements for property and sales tax refunds, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2016 H.J. 710 |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 23, 2016 H.J. 650 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 398 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 455 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 326 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 306 |
2016-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 383 |
2016-02-09 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2016-02-09 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1081na |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2016-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 150 |