SD HB1079 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize certain physical therapists to perform dry needling as a treatment technique.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize certain physical therapists to perform dry needling as a treatment technique.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-20 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 59 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01SenateSigned by the Governor on March 1, 2018 H.J. 660
2018-02-26SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 26, 2018 H.J. 596
2018-02-23SenateSigned by the President S.J. 588
2018-02-21SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 540
2018-02-20SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 488
2018-02-14SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 466
2018-02-12SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2018-02-12SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 429
2018-02-12SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1079ka
2018-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 249
2018-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 6. H.J. 186
2018-01-23HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2. H.J. 142
2018-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-16HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 64

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1079&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1079P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1079SHE.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/HB1079ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24750&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24862&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24750&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24862&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25639&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25836&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=26023&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback