SD HB1078 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 431
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 431
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the regulation of teams and team leaders regarding real estate transactions.
Title
Provide for the regulation of teams and team leaders regarding real estate transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 40 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 431 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 342 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 28. H.J. 330 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 330 Amendment 1078dc |
2017-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 314 |
2017-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 296 |
2017-02-01 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 244 |
2017-02-01 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1078da |
2017-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 176 |