SD HB1077 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update certain language regarding capital punishment and to revise the mandatory sentence for persons with an intellectual disability convicted of murder in the first degree.
Title
Update certain language regarding capital punishment and to revise the mandatory sentence for persons with an intellectual disability convicted of murder in the first degree.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 28, 2018 H.J. 644 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 623 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 1. H.J. 572 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 5. S.J. 538 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 538 Amendment 1077ja |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 479 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1077wa |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 201 |
2018-01-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 0. H.J. 134 |
2018-01-19 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 105 |
2018-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-16 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 64 |