SD HB1074 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 41. H.J. 339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 41. H.J. 339
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the allowable time periods for use of nonresident small game hunting licenses.
Title
Revise the allowable time periods for use of nonresident small game hunting licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Paul Dennert [D] |
Sen. Cooper Garnos [R] | Rep. Kent Juhnke [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] |
Rep. James Schaefer [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 28 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 28, NAYS 41. H.J. 339 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 339 Amendment 1074ta | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304 | |
2011-02-03 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 274 | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 137 |