SD HB1073 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-4)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal certain provisions regarding gifts from registered lobbyists to public officials.
Title
Revise and repeal certain provisions regarding gifts from registered lobbyists to public officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 756 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 739 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 722 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 3. H.J. 711 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 663 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 633 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073fa |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-03-01 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment 1073cb |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 401 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 387 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 387 Amendment 1073xa |
2017-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378 |
2017-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352 |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 303 |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073ja |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073wd |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073wb |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073we |
2017-02-06 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1073wf |
2017-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 162 |