SD HB1072 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 771
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal and revise certain provisions relating to permits to carry a concealed pistol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal and revise certain provisions relating to permits to carry a concealed pistol.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - House - House Veto override (Y: 36 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateDelivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State H.J. 771
2017-03-27SenateVeto override, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 33. H.J. 767
2017-03-27SenateVetoed by the Governor on March 17, 2017 H.J. 764
2017-03-09SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738
2017-03-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 686
2017-03-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2017-03-06SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 647
2017-03-01SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 615
2017-03-01SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 555
2017-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 30. H.J. 513
2017-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477
2017-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438
2017-02-15HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 398
2017-02-15HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1072wa
2017-02-15HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-31HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 227
2017-01-23HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 162

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=1072&Session=2017
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1072P.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1072HST.pdf
Texthttp://legis.sd.gov/docs/legsession/2017/Bills/HB1072ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23302&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23662&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=23960&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24111&Session=2017&Session=2017
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24337&Session=2017&Session=2017

Bill Comments 750

feedback