SD HB1069 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modify the expenditures that are recoverable as disbursements by a prevailing party in a civil action or a special proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify the expenditures that are recoverable as disbursements by a prevailing party in a civil action or a special proceeding.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Concurred in amendments (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HouseSigned by the Governor on March 03, 2021 H.J. 478
2021-02-25HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 25, 2021 H.J. 398
2021-02-24SenateSigned by the President S.J. 344
2021-02-23HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 354
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 327
2021-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 323
2021-02-16SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 268
2021-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 251
2021-02-09SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
2021-02-09SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 1069A
2021-02-09SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 125
2021-01-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 5. H.J. 132
2021-01-25HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
2021-01-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 59
2021-01-20HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 52

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback