SD HB1069 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 76-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 2, 2017 H.J. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal and revise certain provisions related to campaign finance and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal and revise certain provisions related to campaign finance and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

Rep. Larry Rhoden [R]Rep. David Anderson [R]Rep. Hugh Bartels [R]Rep. Arch Beal [R]
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R]Rep. Blaine Campbell [R]Rep. Lance Carson [R]Rep. Roger Chase [R]
Rep. Michael Clark [R]Rep. Kristin Conzet [R]Rep. Drew Dennert [R]Sen. Mary Duvall [R]
Rep. Bob Glanzer [R]Rep. Spencer Gosch [R]Rep. Lana Greenfield [R]Sen. Jenna Netherton [R]
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R]Rep. Leslie Heinemann [R]Rep. Greg Jamison [R]Rep. Kevin Jensen [R]
Sen. Timothy Johns [R]Sen. David Johnson [R]Rep. Dan Kaiser [R]Rep. Chris Karr [R]
Rep. Jason Kettwig [R]Rep. Isaac Latterell [R]Rep. Steve Livermont [R]Rep. Sam Marty [R]
Rep. Elizabeth May [R]Rep. Sean Mcpherson [R]Rep. Mark Mickelson [R]Rep. John Mills [R]
Sen. Herman Otten [R]Rep. Kent Peterson [R]Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R]Rep. Tom Pischke [R]
Rep. Lee Qualm [R]Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R]Rep. Tim Rounds [R]Rep. Tona Rozum [R]
Rep. James Schaefer [R]Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R]Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R]Rep. Burt Tulson [R]
Rep. Charles Turbiville [R]Rep. Mark Willadsen [R]Rep. Matthew Wollmann [R]Rep. Nancy York [R]
Sen. Larry Zikmund [R]Sen. Brock Greenfield [R]Sen. Jim Bolin [R]Sen. Gary Cammack [R]
Sen. Justin Cronin [R]Sen. Richard Curd [R]Sen. Bob Ewing [R]Sen. Terri Haverly [R]
Rep. Phil Jensen [R]Sen. Joshua Klumb [R]Sen. Jack Kolbeck [R]Sen. Kris Langer [R]
Sen. Ryan Maher [R]Sen. Jeff Monroe [R]Sen. Jenna Netherton [R]Sen. Al Novstrup [R]
Rep. Ernie Otten [R]Sen. Jeff Partridge [R]Sen. Deb Peters [R]Sen. Arthur Rusch [R]
Sen. Deb Soholt [R]Sen. Alan Solano [R]Sen. Jim Stalzer [R]Sen. Neal Tapio [R]
Rep. Larry Tidemann [R]Sen. Jim White [R]Sen. John Wiik [R]Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R]

Roll Calls

2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06SenateSigned by the Governor on February 2, 2017 H.J. 302
2017-02-02SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 02, 2017 H.J. 286
2017-02-02SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 268
2017-02-02SenateSigned by the President S.J. 269
2017-02-01SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 261
2017-01-26SenateDeferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 225
2017-01-25SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 194
2017-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 191
2017-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 180
2017-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 179 Amendment 1069fa
2017-01-23HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 168
2017-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-20HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 98

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback