SD HB1069 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-04 - Signed by Governor H.J. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the transportation of alcoholic beverages and to authorize transportation by religious organizations under certain circumstances.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the transportation of alcoholic beverages and to authorize transportation by religious organizations under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Signed by Governor H.J. 694 | |
2010-03-02 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 663 | |
2010-03-01 | Signed by President S.J. 500 | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 619 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Commerce Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 427 | |
2010-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-02 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce S.J. 210 | |
2010-02-01 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 5. H.J. 251 | |
2010-01-27 | Commerce Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 192 | |
2010-01-27 | Commerce Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1069sa | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce H.J. 108 |