SD HB1068 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the collection of motor fuel tax from interstate fuel users.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the collection of motor fuel tax from interstate fuel users.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 5, 2018 H.J. 352 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on January 30, 2018 H.J. 220 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 260 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 188 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 203 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 167 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 136 |
2018-01-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 84 |
2018-01-16 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 59 |
2018-01-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 30 |