SD HB1068 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 18. S.J. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 18. S.J. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions relating to the use of dogs in hunting mountain lions.
Title
Revise provisions relating to the use of dogs in hunting mountain lions.
Sponsors
Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Dan Kaiser [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Sen. Lance Russell [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 14 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 48 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 18. S.J. 489 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 467 |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 416 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 391 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 372 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. S.J. 341 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 240 |
2014-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 22. H.J. 297 |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-30 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 170 |
2014-01-30 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1068ta |
2014-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 58 |