SD HB1066 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and repeal provisions regarding aviation.
Title
Revise and repeal provisions regarding aviation.
Sponsors
Sen. David Johnson [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] | Sen. Shawn Bordeaux [D] |
Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Caleb Finck [R] |
Rep. Timothy Goodwin [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Dayle Hammock [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] |
Rep. Kevin Jensen [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] | Rep. Lance Koth [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Sen. Tom Pischke [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] |
Rep. James Wangsness [R] | Rep. Kaleb Weis [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Richard Curd [R] | Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2020 H.J. 373 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 20, 2020 H.J. 326 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 259 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 304 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 230 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 158 |
2020-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 181 |
2020-01-30 | House | Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-30 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1066B |
2020-01-30 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1066A |
2020-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 38 |