SD HB1065 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor H.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the requirement that the Unified Judicial System set forth a schedule for all fees paid directly to court reporters in its annual consolidated budget.
Title
Repeal the requirement that the Unified Judicial System set forth a schedule for all fees paid directly to court reporters in its annual consolidated budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor H.J. 708 | |
2012-02-24 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 486 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-30 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 213 | |
2012-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 228 | |
2012-01-25 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 192 | |
2012-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 55 |