SD HB1064 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for and the establishment of peer support and critical incident stress management training for first responder organizations, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for and the establishment of peer support and critical incident stress management training for first responder organizations, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - Referred to (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-03-03SenateCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1064D
2021-03-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-03-01SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 364
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 412
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 412 Amendment 1064B
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1064A
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-17HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-01-28HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2021-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-19HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 35

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback