SD HB1064 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the Supreme Court to establish certain rules for the use of interactive audio visual equipment and to provide for the collection and deposit of fees for the use thereof.
Title
Allow the Supreme Court to establish certain rules for the use of interactive audio visual equipment and to provide for the collection and deposit of fees for the use thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 720 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 639 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by President S.J. 563 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 588 | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 508 | |
2012-02-21 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 483 | |
2012-02-16 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 463 | |
2012-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 196 | |
2012-01-25 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 203 | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 189 | |
2012-01-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 167 | |
2012-01-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-19 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 55 |