SD HB1063 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to contract for mental health insurance for certain first responder organizations and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to contract for mental health insurance for certain first responder organizations and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Tabled (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Referred as Amended to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Commerce and Energy: Referred as Amended to (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 411 |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-23 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1063B |
2021-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2021-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Referred as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-05 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1063A |
2021-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 48 |