SD HB1063 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions relating to the payment of special assessments.
Title
Repeal certain provisions relating to the payment of special assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 686 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 641 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 616 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 523 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 467 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1063aa |
2017-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 97 |