SD HB1062 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor H.J. 740
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act.
Title
Adopt the Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Dan Dryden [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] |
Sen. Thomas Nelson [R] | Sen. Eldon Nygaard [D] | Rep. Tad Perry [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] |
Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Rep. Fred Romkema [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor H.J. 740 | |
2011-03-09 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 705 | |
2011-03-08 | Signed by President S.J. 663 | |
2011-03-07 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 652 | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 615 | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 599 | |
2011-03-01 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 566 | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 357 | |
2011-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 303 | |
2011-02-02 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 260 | |
2011-02-02 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1062ra | |
2011-02-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-26 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-01-26 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 128 |