SD HB1061 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of two athletic and recreation fields and related structures at Northern State University, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of two athletic and recreation fields and related structures at Northern State University, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22SenateSigned by the Governor on February 22, 2018 H.J. 544
2018-02-21SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 21, 2018 H.J. 520
2018-02-20SenateSigned by the President S.J. 513
2018-02-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 413
2018-02-07SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 406
2018-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 387
2018-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 339
2018-02-02HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 322
2018-02-01HouseJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 2. H.J. 274
2018-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09HouseFirst read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 29

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback