SD HB1061 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding consent for correspondence through electronic mail by enrolled customers of portable electronics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding consent for correspondence through electronic mail by enrolled customers of portable electronics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-06SenateSigned by the Governor on March 2, 2017 H.J. 618
2017-02-27SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 27, 2017 H.J. 559
2017-02-24SenateSigned by the President S.J. 562
2017-02-22SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 479
2017-02-21SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 453
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2017-02-16SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 409
2017-02-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-02-07SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 327
2017-02-06HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 313
2017-02-03HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 296
2017-02-02HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 286
2017-02-01HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 242
2017-02-01HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-01-20HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 96

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback