SD HB1061 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-17 - Signed by Governor H.J. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal an outdated and obsolete provision related to transferring cases from inferior courts to circuit courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal an outdated and obsolete provision related to transferring cases from inferior courts to circuit courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-17SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 406
2015-02-09SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 354
2015-02-06SenateSigned by President S.J. 324
2015-02-05SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 317
2015-02-04SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 284
2015-02-03SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-02-03SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 257
2015-02-03SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-01-27SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 194
2015-01-26HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 161
2015-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-01-23HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 115
2015-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-01-20HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 56

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback