SD HB1061 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor H.J. 676
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Include limited liability companies in certain provisions regarding the licensing of boats and motor vehicles and certain provisions regarding the dealers and manufacturers of certain vehicles, manufactured homes, and mobile homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Include limited liability companies in certain provisions regarding the licensing of boats and motor vehicles and certain provisions regarding the dealers and manufacturers of certain vehicles, manufactured homes, and mobile homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-10SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 676
2014-03-04SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 637
2014-03-03SenateSigned by President S.J. 524
2014-02-27SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 594
2014-02-26SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 485
2014-02-25SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 467
2014-02-24SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441
2014-02-21SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 416
2014-02-20SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 391
2014-02-19SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 372
2014-02-18SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 354
2014-02-13SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 336
2014-02-12SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 318
2014-02-11SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 300
2014-02-10SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 276
2014-02-06SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 239
2014-02-04SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-02-04SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 194
2014-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-28SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 133
2014-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 107
2014-01-23HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-01-23HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 76
2014-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-01-14HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 27

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback