SD HB1061 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-24 - Signed by Governor H.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend certain provisions related to interpreter services in the court system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend certain provisions related to interpreter services in the court system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-24 Signed by Governor H.J. 594
2012-02-22 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559
2012-02-21 Signed by President S.J. 491
2012-02-16 Signed by Speaker H.J. 513
2012-02-15 Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 441
2012-02-14 Placed on consent, Passed
2012-02-14 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 402
2012-02-14 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-25 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 178
2012-01-24 House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 180
2012-01-23 Placed on consent, Passed
2012-01-23 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 168
2012-01-23 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-19 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 54

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback