SD HB1061 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-25 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-25 - Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 534
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the practice and regulation of registered midwives.
Title
Provide for the practice and regulation of registered midwives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Motion to amend (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 37 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | Health and Human Services Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 534 | |
2011-02-25 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 5. | |
2011-02-25 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. Amendment 1061jf | |
2011-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 401 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 32. H.J. 335 | |
2011-02-09 | House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 334 | |
2011-02-08 | Intent to reconsider H.J. 326 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 31. H.J. 325 | |
2011-02-08 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 325 Amendment 1061jc | |
2011-02-03 | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 274 | |
2011-02-03 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1061ja | |
2011-02-03 | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1061ra | |
2011-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 128 |