SD HB1060 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, dentists, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to reimburse certain family physicians, dentists, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners who have complied with the requirements of the recruitment assistance program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 716 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 600 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 574 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 558 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 538 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 518 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 486 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 194 |
2015-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 170 |
2015-01-23 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 115 |
2015-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 39 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 34 |