SD HB1060 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Signed by Governor H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Signed by Governor H.J. 410
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning how motor vehicle license fees are distributed in the unorganized territories of a county.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning how motor vehicle license fees are distributed in the unorganized territories of a county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Signed by Governor H.J. 410 | |
2011-02-14 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 385 | |
2011-02-10 | Signed by President S.J. 404 | |
2011-02-09 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 347 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 360 | |
2011-02-07 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-07 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 329 | |
2011-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 227 | |
2011-01-26 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 187 | |
2011-01-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-25 | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 162 | |
2011-01-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 128 |