SD HB1058 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 47. H.J. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-27 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 47. H.J. 149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the available forms of medical cannabis products.
Title
Revise the available forms of medical cannabis products.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Rep. Rocky Blare [R] |
Rep. Rhonda Milstead [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] | Rep. Marli Wiese [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 21, NAYS 47. H.J. 149 |
2022-01-26 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. |
2022-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 22 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |