SD HB1057 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor H.J. 860
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and update certain provisions relating to dairy production and inspection.
Title
Revise and update certain provisions relating to dairy production and inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor H.J. 860 | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 846 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 1. H.J. 804 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 592 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 591 Amendment 1057rb | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 573 | |
2010-03-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 506 | |
2010-03-02 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1057td | |
2010-03-02 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 460 | |
2010-02-23 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 573 | |
2010-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 560 | |
2010-02-18 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 461 | |
2010-02-18 | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. Amendment 1057ta | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-12 | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 29 |