SD HB1056 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 157
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize video monitoring of residents in assisted living centers and nursing facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize video monitoring of residents in assisted living centers and nursing facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 157
2020-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 182
2020-02-05HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 182 Amendment 1056C
2020-01-30HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2020-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-28HouseHealth and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1056B
2020-01-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-21HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 19
2020-01-14HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback