SD HB1056 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain property tax levies for the general fund of school districts and to revise the state aid to education formula.
Title
Revise certain property tax levies for the general fund of school districts and to revise the state aid to education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2018 H.J. 795 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 788 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 791 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 790 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 3. S.J. 772 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 772 |
2018-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 15. H.J. 757 |
2018-03-08 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Title amended, Passed H.J. 743 Amendment 1056btb |
2018-03-08 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. |
2018-03-08 | House | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1056ba |
2018-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | House | First read in House and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 28 |