SD HB1056 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Signed by Governor H.J. 454
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions of the South Dakota Business Corporations Act regarding the issuance of shares and cumulative voting for directors.
Title
Revise certain provisions of the South Dakota Business Corporations Act regarding the issuance of shares and cumulative voting for directors.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Abdallah [R] | Sen. Joni Cutler [R] | Rep. Marc Feinstein [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] |
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] |
Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Signed by Governor H.J. 454 | |
2012-02-09 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 397 | |
2012-02-08 | Signed by President S.J. 327 | |
2012-02-07 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 350 | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 285 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 260 | |
2012-02-01 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 241 | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 177 | |
2012-01-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 185 | |
2012-01-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 165 | |
2012-01-20 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 62 | |
2012-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-13 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 45 |