SD HB1054 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 333
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the production and sale of industrial hemp.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the production and sale of industrial hemp.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-18SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 333
2016-02-18SenateAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 5.
2016-02-18SenateScheduled for hearing
2016-02-05SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 233
2016-02-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 294
2016-02-02HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 230
2016-02-02HouseAgriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. Amendment 1054ca
2016-02-02HouseScheduled for hearing
2016-01-19HouseReferred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources, Passed H.J. 55
2016-01-15HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 50

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback