SD HB1053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 30. S.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-28 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 30. S.J. 415
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize counties to issue bonds for certain expenditures funded by a gross receipts tax.
Title
Authorize counties to issue bonds for certain expenditures funded by a gross receipts tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] | Rep. Nancy York [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Deferred to another day (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Deferred to another day (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 4, NAYS 30. S.J. 415 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-16 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 276 |
2022-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 22. H.J. 327 |
2022-02-10 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 1 Amendment 1053D |
2022-02-10 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 1 Amendment 1053K |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-03 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 Amendment 1053J |
2022-02-03 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 1 Amendment 1053I |
2022-02-03 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 Amendment 1053F |
2022-02-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-27 | House | Taxation Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 Amendment 1053E |
2022-01-27 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1053B |
2022-01-27 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1053A |
2022-01-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 22 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |