SD HB1053 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 H.J. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the attorney recruitment assistance program.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the attorney recruitment assistance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 46 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 H.J. 720 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 H.J. 700 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 655 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 604 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. S.J. 582 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 222 |
2017-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 21. H.J. 201 |
2017-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 183 |
2017-01-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 168 |
2017-01-20 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 93 |
2017-01-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 69 |