SD HB1051 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend certain provisions relating to the small business credit initiative fund.
Title
Amend certain provisions relating to the small business credit initiative fund.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 662 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 509 |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 635 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 330 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 20. H.J. 436 |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 2. |
2022-02-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-01-31 | House | State Affairs Referred as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-31 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. Amendment 1051A |
2022-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 35 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |