SD HB1050 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for voter registration through an online voter registration system provided by the Office of the Secretary of State.
Title
Provide for voter registration through an online voter registration system provided by the Office of the Secretary of State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 6. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1050E |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-07 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 168 |
2020-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 26. H.J. 220 |
2020-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 220 Amendment 1050C |
2020-02-04 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. |
2020-02-04 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1050A |
2020-02-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-21 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 37 |
2020-01-14 | House | First Reading House H.J. 11 |