SD HB1049 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor H.J. 783
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal certain provisions regarding reversions of appropriations for a repealed tax refund program.
Title
Repeal certain provisions regarding reversions of appropriations for a repealed tax refund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 783 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 770 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 711 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 730 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 658 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 643 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 627 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 612 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 590 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 556 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 194 |
2015-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 169 |
2015-01-23 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 115 |
2015-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 39 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 31 |