SD HB1048 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize a public body to conduct certain deliberations in an executive or closed meeting.
Title
Authorize a public body to conduct certain deliberations in an executive or closed meeting.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Rep. Doug Barthel [R] | Sen. Arch Beal [R] |
Rep. Roger Chase [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Sen. Michael Diedrich [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] |
Rep. Caleb Finck [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] |
Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Doug Post [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Rebecca Reimer [R] |
Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Rep. Nancy York [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Bob Ewing [R] |
Sen. Kris Langer [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 08, 2019 H.J. 336 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 305 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 311 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 267 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 256 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 223 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 191 |
2019-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 172 |
2019-01-23 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-01-23 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 155 |
2019-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-14 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 51 |
Subjects
Counties
Municipal Government
Open Meetings
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees
State Affairs and Government
Municipal Government
Open Meetings
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees
State Affairs and Government