SD HB1047 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding military affairs.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding military affairs.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 24, 2023 H.J. 370 |
2023-02-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 16, 2023 H.J. 312 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 278 |
2023-02-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 287 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 235 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 4 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 4 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 149 |
2023-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 171 |
2023-01-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent H.J. 2 |
2023-01-25 | House | Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 2 |
2023-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 24 |
2023-01-10 | House | First Reading House H.J. 14 |