SD HB1047 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 668
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to the Department of Education to improve and renovate the Cultural Heritage Center and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to the Department of Education to improve and renovate the Cultural Heritage Center and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Referred to (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Joint - Do Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Referred to (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - Referred to (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 668 |
2022-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2022 H.J. 594 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 457 |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 536 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 413 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 398 |
2022-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 469 |
2022-02-23 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. J.J. 1 |
2022-02-23 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 21 |
2022-01-11 | House | First Reading House H.J. 7 |